MO SB611 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to the regulation of transportation
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to the regulation of transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] | Rep. Rick Stream [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCS H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR H adopted (4983S03.01F) | |
2012-05-18 | CCS S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR S offered & adopted (4983S03.1SR) | |
2012-05-14 | H submits CCR | |
2012-05-08 | S conferees appointed: Lembke, Stouffer, Kehoe, McKenna, Wright-Jones | |
2012-05-07 | H conferees appointed: Stream, Silvey, Flanigan, Kelly-24, Lampe | |
2012-05-07 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2012-05-02 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2012-05-02 | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7 & HA 8 | |
2012-05-01 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted | |
2012-05-01 | HA 8 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(4983S01.13H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 7 H offered & adopted (Long)--(4983S01.20H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(4983S01.11H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Flanigan)--(4983S01.22H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Silvey)--(4983S01.23H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Hough)--(4983S01.17H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(4983S01.12H) | |
2012-05-01 | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(4983S01.02H) | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-19 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-17 | H Second Read | |
2012-02-16 | H First Read | |
2012-02-16 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Perfected | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-08 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-05 | S First Read--SB 611-Lembke |