MO SB592 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the Missouri Human Rights Act and employment discrimination
Title
Modifies the law relating to the Missouri Human Rights Act and employment discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Elmer [R] | Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-17 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2012-04-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2012-04-16 | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Hearing Continued H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2012-02-13 | H Second Read | |
2012-02-09 | H First Read | |
2012-02-08 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-08 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Perfected | |
2012-02-01 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2012-02-01 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4933S05.01S) | |
2012-02-01 | SS for SCS S offered (Lager)--(4933S.05F) | |
2012-02-01 | SA 3 to SCS S withdrawn | |
2012-02-01 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-01-25 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-01-25 | SA 3 to SCS S offered (Lager)--(4933S02.22S) | |
2012-01-25 | SA 2 to SCS S adopted | |
2012-01-25 | SSA 1 for SA 2 to SCS S offered & defeated (Justus)--(4933S02.04S) | |
2012-01-25 | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Dixon)--(4933S02.25S) | |
2012-01-25 | SA 1 to SCS S defeated | |
2012-01-25 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-01-25 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-01-23 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Callahan)--(4933S02.01F) | |
2012-01-12 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-01-12 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - 4933S.02C | |
2012-01-10 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 592-Lager | |
2012-01-03 | Prefiled |