MO SB580 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee | |
2010-04-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Referred H Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-22 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-18 | H First Read (w/EC) | |
2010-02-18 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-18 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Perfected | |
2010-02-10 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-02-10 | SA 33 to SS for SCS S adopted | |
2010-02-10 | SSA 1 for SA 33 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Schaefer)--(3635S04.52S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 33 to SS for SCS S offered (Crowell)--(3635S04.02S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 32 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(3635S04.06S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 31 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Ridgeway)--(3635S04.32S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 30 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lembke)--(8048S10.01S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 29 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(3635S04.51S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 28 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Green)--(8028S10.01S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 27 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Green)--(8027S10.01S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 26 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Green)--(3635S04.46S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 25 to SS for SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Green)--(3635S04.07S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 24 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nodler)--(3635S04.49S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 23 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Barnitz)--(3635S04.40S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 22 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lager)--(3635S04.48S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 21 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Purgason)--(3635S04.45S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 20 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Bray)--(3635S04.31S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 19 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nodler)--(3635S04.47S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 18 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(3635S04.11S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 17 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(8032S10.01S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 16 to SS for SCS, as amended, S defeated | |
2010-02-10 | SA 1 to SA 16 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Dempsey)--(3635S04.01F) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 16 to SS for SCS S offered (Dempsey)--(3635S04.19S) | |
2010-02-10 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-10 | SA 15 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(8038S10.01S) | |
2010-02-10 | SA 14 to SS for SCS S withdrawn | |
2010-02-09 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | SA 14 to SS for SCS S offered (Nodler)--(8047S10.01S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 13 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Bartle)--(3635S04.25S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 12 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(3635S04.10S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 11 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(3635S04.24S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 10 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Engler)--(3635S04.23S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 9 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(3635S04.14S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 8 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lager)--(8042S10.01S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 7 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lager)--(8020S10.01S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Barnitz)--(3635S04.22S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Barnitz)--(8043S10.01S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(3635S04.20S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaeffer)--(3635S04.16S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(3635S04.12S) | |
2010-02-09 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(3635S04.15S) | |
2010-02-09 | SS for SCS S offered (Griesheimer)--(3635S.04F) | |
2010-02-02 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-01-27 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (3635S.03C) | |
2010-01-20 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 580-Griesheimer | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |