MO SB557 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Third Read and Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Third Read and Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law with respect to the issuance of certificates of titles
Title
Modifies the law with respect to the issuance of certificates of titles
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Ward Franz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-18 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(4558L02.06H) | |
2012-05-18 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(4558L02.05H) | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-26 | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-12 | Referred H General Laws Committee | |
2012-03-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-22 | H First Read | |
2012-03-22 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Perfected | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-01 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 557-Brown | |
2011-12-12 | Prefiled |