MO SB555 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 555 & 609-Brown, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 555 & 609-Brown, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the law pertaining to prevailing wage
Title
Repeals the law pertaining to prevailing wage
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 555 & 609-Brown, with SCS |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 555 & 609) General Laws Committee (4259S.02C) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 555-Brown |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |