MO SB552 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the termination of alimony and maintenance payments
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the termination of alimony and maintenance payments
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 552-Sater |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723586 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB552.pdf |