MO SB549 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 549-Lembke
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 549-Lembke
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies how school districts maintain vacant or unused school buildings
Title
Modifies how school districts maintain vacant or unused school buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 549-Lembke | |
2012-03-26 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-26 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-29 | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 549-Lembke | |
2011-12-12 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3900 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB549.pdf |