MO SB547 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 547-Purgason
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 547-Purgason
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bars employers from requiring employees to engage in or cease engaging in certain labor practices
Title
Bars employers from requiring employees to engage in or cease engaging in certain labor practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 547-Purgason | |
2012-01-31 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-01-26 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor | |
2012-01-24 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 547-Purgason | |
2011-12-12 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3687 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB547.pdf |