MO SB540 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 540-Libla (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 540-Libla (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the tax on motor fuel and creates the Public-Private Partnership Authority Act
Title
Raises the tax on motor fuel and creates the Public-Private Partnership Authority Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 540-Libla (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SA 2 to SS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SA 2 to SA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(2282S05.22S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(2282S05.21S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Schaaf)--(2282S05.20S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Schaaf)--(2282S05.18S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | SS S offered (Libla)--(2282S.05F) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 540-Libla |