MO SB539 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (2283S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (2283S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to employment security
Title
Creates new provisions relating to employment security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (2283S.03C) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | S First Read |