MO SB539 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the county commission, or a county officer designated by the county commission, to provide passport services if the circuit court clerk does not provide the services
Title
Allows the county commission, or a county officer designated by the county commission, to provide passport services if the circuit court clerk does not provide the services
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Cloria Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | HCS H defeated |
2015-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government w/Amendments |
2015-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Local Government Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-04-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (2372S.02C) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 539-Brown |