MO SB53 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - In Conference--SB 53-Crawford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the duties of county officials

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the duties of county officials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: SB 53 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: SB 53 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 115 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseIn Conference--SB 53-Crawford, with HCS, as amended
2019-05-01HouseHouse conferees appointed: Reedy, Hicks, Ross, Ellebracht, Runions
2019-05-01HouseSenate conferees appointed: Crawford, Sater, Hough, Sifton, Rizzo
2019-05-01HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-04-30HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-04-30HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-04-30HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-04-29HouseHA 7 to HCS H withdrawn
2019-04-24HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-24HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered (DeGroot)--(0294H03.07H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 6 to HCS, as amended, H defeated
2019-04-24HouseHA 3 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0294H03.27H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & ruled out of order (McCreery)--(0294H03.22H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(0294H03.21H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered (McGaugh)--(0294H03.19H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(0294H03.18H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-04-24HouseHA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ellebracht)--(0294H03.20H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered (Hicks)--(0294H03.09H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Ruth)--(0294H03.11H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reedy)--(0294H03.08H)
2019-04-24HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hicks)--(0294H03.10H)
2019-04-24HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-18HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-18HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-11HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government
2019-04-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government
2019-04-02HouseHearing Conducted H Local Government
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Local Government
2019-03-01HouseH Second Read
2019-02-28HouseH First Read
2019-02-28SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-02-25SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-25SenatePerfected, as amended
2019-02-25SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0294S02.01S)
2019-02-14SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-02-13SenateVoted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 53-Crawford
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback