MO SB53 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 53-Lamping
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 53-Lamping
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bars entities that invest in the energy sector in Iran from contracting with the state and political subdivisions
Title
Bars entities that invest in the energy sector in Iran from contracting with the state and political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 53-Lamping |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 53-Lamping |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=16944758 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB53.pdf |