MO SB514 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to health care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to health care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 514 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 514 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 514 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16HouseS Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
2019-05-16HouseS concurs in HA 2
2019-05-16HouseS concurs in HA 1
2019-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-16HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-15HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-15HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (Wood)--(2440S01.01H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (Wood)--(2440S01.03H)
2019-05-15HouseHCS H defeated
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Children and Families
2019-05-08HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Children and Families
2019-05-08HouseHearing Conducted H Children and Families
2019-05-06HouseReferred H Children and Families
2019-05-06HouseH Second Read
2019-05-02HouseH First Read
2019-05-02SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-05-02SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-05-01SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-29SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-29SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-25SenatePerfected
2019-04-04SenateReported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-04-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-03-27SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-03-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-02-28SenateS First Read--SB 514-Sater

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5255853
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB514.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB514.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0514.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/tat/SB514.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay610502971-985.pdf#975
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/071.015.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/071.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905161470-1606.pdf#1588
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805161470-1606.pdf#1588

Bill Comments

feedback