MO SB510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to operation of motor vehicles
Title
Modifies provisions relating to operation of motor vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 510-Dixon |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=61385206 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB510.pdf |