MO SB5 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the enrollment of nonresident students in public school districts
Title
Allows the enrollment of nonresident students in public school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Education and Workforce Development Committee w/SCS |
2023-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (0854S.03C) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |