MO SB495 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals certain duties of the Joint Committee on Government Accountability
Title
Repeals certain duties of the Joint Committee on Government Accountability
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 495-Emery |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5253274 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB495.pdf |