MO SB487 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to campaign finance
Title
Modifies the law relating to campaign finance
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Rupp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 487-Rupp |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723559 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB487.pdf |