MO SB479 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 479-Crowell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 479-Crowell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates certain employee benefits for members of the General Assembly and statewide elected officials who first take office on or after January 1, 2013
Title
Eliminates certain employee benefits for members of the General Assembly and statewide elected officials who first take office on or after January 1, 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 479-Crowell | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee to Floor | |
2012-01-26 | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 479-Crowell | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=77 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB479.pdf |