MO SB478 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires registration with the Department of Health and Senior Services for supplemental health care services agencies
Title
Requires registration with the Department of Health and Senior Services for supplemental health care services agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | S First Read |