MO SB478 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 478-Silvey and Holsman, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 478-Silvey and Holsman, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to educational institutions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to educational institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 478 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 478-Silvey and Holsman, with HCS, as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater-49)--(2142H02.27H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Spencer)--(2142H02.19H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes-60)--(2142H02.13H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2017-04-25 | House | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2017-03-30 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee - Consent |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 478-Silvey and Holsman |