MO SB475 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 475-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 475-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for the Department of Transportation to participate in arbitration as a defendant at the request of the plaintiff in a tort claim
Title
Repeals the requirement for the Department of Transportation to participate in arbitration as a defendant at the request of the plaintiff in a tort claim
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 475-Schatz |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 475-Schatz |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=61194876 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB475.pdf |