MO SB475 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS#2 for SB 475-Dempsey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS#2 for SB 475-Dempsey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the President Pro Tem and the Speaker standing to intervene in cases challenging the constitutionality of state law and authorizes individual legislators to hire outside counsel when sued in their official capacity
Title
Grants the President Pro Tem and the Speaker standing to intervene in cases challenging the constitutionality of state law and authorizes individual legislators to hire outside counsel when sued in their official capacity
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dempsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS#2 for SB 475-Dempsey |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SS#2, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Dempsey)--(0937S09.04S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Dempsey)--(0937S.09F) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(0937S05.04S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SS S offered (Dempsey)--(0937S.08F) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 475-Dempsey |