MO SB471 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (1643S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (1643S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to animal chiropractic practitioners
Title
Modifies provisions related to animal chiropractic practitioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (1643S.02C) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-01-09 | Senate | S First Read |