MO SB463 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1844S.07C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1844S.07C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to public contracts
Title
Creates new provisions relating to public contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1844S.07C) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 463-Burlison |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5152978 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB463.pdf |