MO SB461 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax credits for the care of certain children
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax credits for the care of certain children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | S First Read |