MO SB45 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 45-Wright-Jones
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 45-Wright-Jones
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires official motor vehicle inspection and emission stations to have liability insurance to cover any possible damages to a vehicle during an inspection
Title
Requires official motor vehicle inspection and emission stations to have liability insurance to cover any possible damages to a vehicle during an inspection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 45-Wright-Jones | |
2011-04-21 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2011-01-26 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 45-Wright-Jones | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4065310 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB45.pdf |