MO SB448 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law regarding the provision of health care through a child support order
Title
Modifies the law regarding the provision of health care through a child support order
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 448-Sater |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5022130 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB448.pdf |