MO SB444 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
Pending: Senate Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
Pending: Senate Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires physicians to complete two hours of suicide prevention training as a condition of licensure
Title
Requires physicians to complete two hours of suicide prevention training as a condition of licensure
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 444-Schupp |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5022126 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB444.pdf |