MO SB44 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 44-Hoskins, with SCS & SS#3 for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 44-Hoskins, with SCS & SS#3 for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to gaming
Title
Modifies provisions relating to gaming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 44-Hoskins, with SCS & SS#3 for SCS (pending) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS#3 for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(0261S.14F) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(0261S13.13S) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S defeated |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (May)--(0261S13.08S) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (May)--(0261S13.02S) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(0261S.13F) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(0261S.08F) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0261S.05C) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 44-Hoskins |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |