MO SB436 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an income tax deduction for certain expenses related to operating a medical marijuana business
Title
Authorizes an income tax deduction for certain expenses related to operating a medical marijuana business
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S First Read |