MO SB43 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 327 & 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 327 & 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Video Lottery Control Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Video Lottery Control Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 327 & 43) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 43-Hoskins |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=64 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB43.pdf |