MO SB423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the termination date for the MO Rx Prescription Drug Program
Title
Removes the termination date for the MO Rx Prescription Drug Program
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 423-Sater |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=59976751 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB423.pdf |