MO SB416 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the purchase of utilities for certain food preparation uses from state sales and use taxes
Title
Exempts the purchase of utilities for certain food preparation uses from state sales and use taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 416-Hoskins |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=59794799 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB416.pdf |