MO SB414 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - 1820S.05C
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - 1820S.05C
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the legal defense of indigent persons
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the legal defense of indigent persons
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - 1820S.05C |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 414-Dixon |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=19219484 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB414.pdf |