MO SB407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to early childhood education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to early childhood education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 407-Wallingford |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4201230 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB407.pdf |