MO SB403 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 (HA 17, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 48 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 (*HA 1 HA 16) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 85 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 (*HA 1 HA 16) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 403 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 85 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | In Conference |
2021-05-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Patterson, Fitzwater, Rone, Proudie, Lewis (25) |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Onder, Koenig, Brattin, Razer, Mosley |
2021-05-11 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2021-05-11 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2021-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 17 to HCS, as amended, H defeated--(1874H04.06H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 3 to HA 17 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Collins)--(1874H04.82H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Thomas)--(1874H04.83H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hovis)--(1874H04.81H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 17 to HCS H offered (Stephens-128)--(1874H04.06H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 16 to HCS H adopted--(1874H04.32H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 16 to HCS H offered & defeated (Collins)--(1874H04.76H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 16 to HCS H offered (Kelley-127)--(1874H04.32H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 15 to HCS H adopted--(1874H04.36H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 15 to HCS H withdrawn--(1874H04.64H) |
2021-05-10 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 15 to HCS H offered (Trent)--(1874H04.64H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered (Wright)--(1874H04.36H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 14 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(1874H04.35H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 3 to HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Aune)--(1874H04.73H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Andrews)--(1874H04.68H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Proudie)--(1874H04.71H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered (Gregory)--(1874H04.35H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 13 to HCS H defeated--(1874H04.02H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 13 to HCS H offered & defeated (Burnett)--(1874H04.40H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered (Collins)--(1874H04.02H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(1874H04.09H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(1874H04.08H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davidson)--(1874H04.22H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(1874H04.05H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stephens-128)--(1874H04.53H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(1874H04.46H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Grier)--(1874H04.62H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Christofanelli)--(1874H04.46H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shields)--(1874H04.57H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(1874H04.44H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory-96)--(1874H04.48H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley-127)--(1874H04.13H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Busick)--(1874H04.26H) |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Patterson)--(1874H04.58H) |
2021-05-05 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2021-03-26 | House | H Second Read |
2021-03-25 | House | H First Read |
2021-03-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2021-03-25 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted (1874S.02C) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (1874S.02C) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | S First Read |