MO SB401 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to debt adjusters
Title
Modifies the law relating to debt adjusters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-04-04 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-03-01 | S First Read--SB 401-Lamping |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4203954 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB401.pdf |