MO SB381 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 381-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 381-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to reports on audits issued by the State Auditor
Title
Modifies provisions relating to reports on audits issued by the State Auditor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 381-Riddle |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 381-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58646615 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB381.pdf |