MO SB378 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies multiple provisions relating to ethics
Title
Modifies multiple provisions relating to ethics
Sponsors
Sen. Caleb Rowden [R] | Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2023-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2023-05-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2023-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2023-04-20 | House | H First Read |
2023-04-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-04-18 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2023-04-18 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (McCreery)--(0415S03.02S) |
2023-04-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Rowden)--(0415S03.01S) |
2023-04-18 | Senate | SS S offered (Rowden)--(0415S.03F) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |