MO SB374 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 374-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 374-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and income tax deduction for payments received as part of a program that compensates agricultural producers for losses from disaster or emergency
Title
Creates and income tax deduction for payments received as part of a program that compensates agricultural producers for losses from disaster or emergency
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 374-Schatz, with SCS |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-04-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1844S.03C) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | S First Read--SB 374-Schatz |