MO SB368 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 368-Rowden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 368-Rowden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits financial information submitted to the Department of Natural Resources from being subject to public disclosure
Title
Prohibits financial information submitted to the Department of Natural Resources from being subject to public disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 368-Rowden |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 368-Rowden |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58644911 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB368.pdf |