MO SB360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 360-Parson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 360-Parson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Civil Litigation Funding Act
Title
Establishes the Civil Litigation Funding Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 360-Parson, with SCS |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-04-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee (1595S.04C) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Progress and Development Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | S First Read--SB 360-Parson |