MO SB355 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - In Conference--SCS for SB 355-Romine, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - In Conference--SCS for SB 355-Romine, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to higher education
Title
Enacts provisions relating to higher education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 355 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 355 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 355 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | In Conference--SCS for SB 355-Romine, with HCS, as amended |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (1582S04.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Romine, Libla, Hoskins, Hummel, Curls |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Alferman, Lichtenegger, Rowland-155, Kendrick, Dunn |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lichtenegger)--(1582H03.06H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HSA 1 for HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(1582H03.22H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Frederick)--(1582H03.12H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Walker)--(1582H03.05H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lichtenegger)--(1582H03.01H) |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2017-03-30 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-28 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered (Consent) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted (1582S.02C) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1582S.02C) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 355-Romine |