MO SB354 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax credits
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Point of order (Brattin) - SS for SCS goes beyond scope of original bill - point of order taken under advisement |
2021-04-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Arthur)--(1679S06.07S) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(1679S.06F) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2021-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (1679S.02C) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2021-01-07 | Senate | S First Read |