MO SB353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 353-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 353-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that royalty payments to a dental franchisor by a licensee of the Dental Board operating a franchised dental office is not unlawful
Title
Specifies that royalty payments to a dental franchisor by a licensee of the Dental Board operating a franchised dental office is not unlawful
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 353-Wallingford, with SCS |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (1577S.03C) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2017-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (1577S.03C) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to return bill to committee on Professional Registration S adopted (Riddle) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee - Consent |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Professional Registration Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 353-Wallingford |