MO SB350 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - No motion made to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the renter's portion of the Senior Citizens Property Tax Credit and creates the Missouri Senior Services Protection Fund
Title
Eliminates the renter's portion of the Senior Citizens Property Tax Credit and creates the Missouri Senior Services Protection Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dempsey [R] | Rep. John Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | No motion made to override Governor's veto |
2013-05-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-13 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Budget Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Budget Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Budget Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred H Budget Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-02 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Appropriations Committee to Floor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 350-Dempsey |