MO SB343 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the period after which a foster parent may adopt a foster child from nine months to six months
Title
Changes the period after which a foster parent may adopt a foster child from nine months to six months
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 343-Libla |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58175878 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB343.pdf |