MO SB336 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provision relating to income tax withholdings on employee's tips
Title
Modifies provision relating to income tax withholdings on employee's tips
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2015-04-30 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | HCS H adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee w/Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred H Ways and Means Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-19 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-19 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-16 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (1746S.02C) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 336-Kraus |