MO SB335 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the duties within the Missouri Department of Agriculture's Weights, Measures and Consumer Protection Division
Title
Modifies the duties within the Missouri Department of Agriculture's Weights, Measures and Consumer Protection Division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |